+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-000-000
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2017
- Be Adopted Transportation; 015-000-000
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary