+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 106-000-000
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 052-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary