+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 17, 2016
- Be Adopted Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the heading with similar language. Adds language regarding Mondelez's State EDGE tax credit status, the company's inability to utilize the EDGE credit, and the use of EDGE credits by other companies.
+ − Vote
May 12, 2016: SR1753 - Commerce and Economic Development
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor