+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted as Amended
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 17, 2016
- Be Adopted Energy and Public Utilities; 011-000-000
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Adds a reference to other funds.
+ − Vote
May 12, 2016: SR1719 - Energy and Public Utilities
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor