+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 15, 2018
- Be Adopted as Amended Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Conservation
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Inserts a clause stating who should receive copies of the resolution.