+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 21, 2019
- Be Adopted Public Health; 012-000-000
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2019: SJR0016 - Human Services
February 19, 2019: SJR0016 - Public Health
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor