+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 19, 2004 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 15, 2003
- Be Adopted Executive; 010-000-000
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor