+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 12, 2005
- Be Adopted State Government; 009-000-000
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor