+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 19, 2015
- Be Adopted Human Services; 006-000-000
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary