+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 28, 2017
- Be Adopted Commerce and Economic Development; 011-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Vote
March 16, 2017: SR0140 - Commerce and Economic Development
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor