+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2018
- Be Adopted Human Services; 008-000-000
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Vote
February 20, 2018: SR1371 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor