+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 13, 2018
- Be Adopted State Government; 006-000-000
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Vote
February 7, 2018: SR1308 - State Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor