+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
- Be Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2018: SFA0001 - Public Health
February 6, 2018: SR1301 - Public Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor