+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 054-000-000
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 6, 2005
- Be Adopted Executive; 012-000-000
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rickey R. Hendon
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Vote
April 21, 2005: SR0102 - Motion To Adopt - Thursday, April 21, 2005
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor