+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 045-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Referred to Assignments
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; on 11/15/2016 - and on 01/10/2017, Due to Sine Die of the 99th General Assembly
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 11/15/2016
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Vote
June 21, 2017: AM990605
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor