+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 034-003-001
- Motion to Reconsider Vote - Prevails
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Don Harmon
- Advise and Consent Lost 027-008-002
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Referred to Assignments
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; on 11/15/2016 - and on 01/10/2017, Due to Sine Die of the 99th General Assembly
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 11/15/2016
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor