+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 054-000-000
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments May 23, 2017
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; on 06/28/2016 - and on 01/10/2017, Due to Sine Die of the 99th General Assembly
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 06/28/2016
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2017: AM990535
May 22, 2017: AM990535 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor