+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 054-000-000
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AMs 990479, 990480, 990482, 990483, 990484, 990487, 990490, 990503, 990504, 990505, 990506, 990524, 1000120, 1000121, 1000122, 1000123, 1000124 (Children and Family Services Advisory Council) AM 990491 (Illinois Community College Board) AMs 990495, 990496, 990497, 990502, 990514, 990519, 990525 (Kaskaskia Regional Port District Board) AM 990499 (Lottery Control Board) AM 990500, 990515, 990517, 990583, 990584, 990615, 1000103 (Illinois Workforce Investment Board) AMs 990628, 1000038, 1000065 (Will County Metropolitan Exposition and Auditorium Authority)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 10-1(c), move to compile the following AM's
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments April 6, 2017
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; on 01/10/2017 - Due to Sine Die of the 99th General Assembly
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 05/17/2016
- Supercedes AM 990489 of the 99th General Assembly on 05/12/2016
- Referred to Assignments; on 05/12/2016
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 05/12/2016
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2017: AM990506
April 4, 2017: AM990506 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor