+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 057-000-000
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 8, 2017
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; on 01/10/2017 - Due to Sine Die of the 99th General Assembly
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 05/11/2016
- Referred to Assignments; on 04/18/2016
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 04/18/2016
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2017: AM990467
February 7, 2017: AM990467 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor