+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 051-000-000
- Motion Prevailed
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 10-1(c), move to compile the following AM's
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AMs 990397, 990398, 990399 (Illinois Community College Board) AMs 990409, 990424 (Illinois State Medical Disciplinary Board) AM 990417 (Capital Development Board) AM 990434 (Board of Trustees of the Teachers' Retirement System) AMs 990438, 990439, 990441, 990442, 990443 (Workers' Compensation Medical Fee Advisory Board) AMs 990516, 990520, 990549, 990587 (Workforce Investment Board) AMs 990553, 990563, 990567 (Illinois Finance Authority) AMs 990579, 990580, 990581, 990582, 990606 (Charitable Trust Stabilization Committee) AM 990611 (Illinois Committee for Agricultural Education) AM 1000068 (Treasurer's Personnel Review Board)
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 15, 2017
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive; 007-000-000
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; on 01/10/2017 - Due to Sine Die of the 99th General Assembly
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 04/06/2016
- Referred to Assignments; on 03/16/2016
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 03/16/2016
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2017: AM990443
February 15, 2017: AM990443 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor