+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 051-000-001
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments May 24, 2016; on 05/23/2016
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 004-000-001; on 05/23/2016
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 01/13/2016
- Referred to Assignments; on 12/07/2015
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 12/07/2015
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Vote
January 25, 2017: AM990373
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor