+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 050-000-000
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments March 24, 2015
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 006-000-000
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2015: AM990044 - Tuesday, March 24, 2015
March 19, 2015: AM990044 - Executive Appointments - Mar 19, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor