+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 048-000-002
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments April 2, 2014; on 04/01/2014
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 011-000-000; on 04/01/2014
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 03/13/2014
- Supercedes Appointment Message 428 of the 98th General Assembly on 02/19/2014
- Referred to Assignments; on 02/19/2014
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 02/19/2014
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Vote
February 17, 2015: AM980598 - Tuesday, February 17, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor