+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 050-000-001
- Motion Prevailed
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 10-1(c), move to compile the following AM's; AM 441, AM 442, AM 443, AM 444, AM 446, and AM 528 (Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Advisory Board) AM 454 and AM 455 (Employment Security Advisory Board) AM 456 (Illinois State Board of Investment) AM 458, AM 459, and AM 460 (Kaskaskia Regional Port District Board) AM 461, AM 462, AM 463, AM 464, AM 465, AM 466, AM 467, AM 554, and AM 555 (State Board of Health) AM 469 (Public Guardian for DuPage County) AM 471, AM 472, and AM 473 (Medical Licensing Board) AM 474, AM 475, AM 476, AM 477, AM 478, and AM 479 (Illinois State Medical Disciplinary Board) AM 480, AM 481, AM 482, AM 483, and AM 484 (Southern Illinois Economic Development Authority) AM 490, AM 491, and AM 492 (State Board of Education) AM 495, AM 496, AM 497, and AM 520 (Board of Trustees of the Teachers' Retirement System of Illinois) AM 498 (Board of Trustees of Governors State University) AM 513, AM 539, and AM 540 (Health Facilities Services and Review Board) AM 514, AM 516, AM 517, AM 518, and AM 519 (Lottery Control Board) AM 521 (Weatherization Initiative Board) AM 523, AM 526, and AM 557 (Illinois Community College Board) AM 524 (Illinois Board of Higher Education) AM 533, AM 534, AM 535, and AM 536 (Quality Care Board) AM 537, AM 538, AM 559, and AM 560 (Illinois Finance Authority ) AM 541, AM 542, AM 543, and AM 544 (Illinois Comprehensive Health Insurance Board) AM 546 and AM 553 (Tri-County River Valley Development Authority Board) AM 547, AM 548, and AM 549 (Board of Trustees of the State Universities Retirement System)
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 5, 2013
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; on 1/08/13 - Due to Sine Die of the 97th General Assembly
- Motion Filed-Appointment Messages be acted on together - Senator Muñoz - AMs 441, 442, 443, 444, 446, and 528 (Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Advisory Board); AMs 454 and 455 (Employment Security Advisory Board); AM 456 (Illinois State Board of Investment); AM 457 (Chicago State University Board of Trustees); AMs 458, 459, and 460 (Kaskaskia Regional Port District Board); AMs 480, 481, 482, 483 and 484 (Southern Illinois Economic Development Authority) AMs 490, 491, and 492 ( State Board of Education) AM 498 (Board of Trustees of Governors State University) AMs 513, 539, and 540 (Health Facilities Services and Review Board) AMs 514, 516, 517, 518, and 519 (Lottery Control Board) AM 521 ( Weatherization Initiative Board) AMs 523 and 526 ( Illinois Community College Board) AM 524 (Illinois Board of Higher Education) AMs 537 and 538 (Illinois Finance Authority) AMs 546 and 553 (Tri-County River Valley Development Authority Board) on 11/28/12
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments on 11/27/12
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000; on 11/27/12
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 11/21/12
- Referred to Assignments; on 11/14/12
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 11/14/12
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Vote
March 1, 2013: AM0546 - Friday, March 01, 2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor