+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
On November 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AMs 441, 442, 443, 444, 446, and 528 (Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Advisory Board); AMs 454 and 455 (Employment Security Advisory Board); AM 456 (Illinois State Board of Investment); AM 457 (Chicago State University Board of Trustees); AMs 458, 459, and 460 (Kaskaskia Regional Port District Board); AMs 480, 481, 482, 483 and 484 (Southern Illinois Economic Development Authority) AMs 490, 491, and 492 ( State Board of Education) AM 498 (Board of Trustees of Governors State University) AMs 513, 539, and 540 (Health Facilities Services and Review Board) AMs 514, 516, 517, 518, and 519 (Lottery Control Board) AM 521 ( Weatherization Initiative Board) AMs 523 and 526 ( Illinois Community College Board) AM 524 (Illinois Board of Higher Education) AMs 537 and 538 (Illinois Finance Authority) AMs 546 and 553 (Tri-County River Valley Development Authority Board)
On November 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments November 28, 2012
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On November 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On November 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor