+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 053-001-001
- Motion Prevailed
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 10-1(c), move to compile the following AM's; AMs 386, 387, 388, 389, 390, 391,392, 393, 394, 395 and 397 (Kaskaskia Regional Port District Board) AMs 398, 399, 400, 401, 402, 403 and 404 (Illinois Affordable Housing Advisory Commission) AMs 405, 406, 407 and 408 (Metropolitan Pier and Exposition Board) AM 412 (Capital Development Board) AM 419 (Merit Commission, Office of the Comptroller) AMs 426 and 427 (Illinois Comprehensive Health Insurance Board) AM 428 (Illinois State Board of Investment) AM 429 (Employment Security Advisory Board) AM 430 (Public Guardian and Public Administrator for Macon County) AM 431 (Public Guardian and Public Administrator for Kane County) AM 432 (State Soil and Water Conservation Districts Advisory Board) AMs 433, 434, 435, 436, 437 and 440 (Southeastern Illinois Economic Development Authority)
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments May 15, 2012
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
May 17, 2012: AM0431 - Thursday, May 17, 2012
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor