+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 051-002-001
- Motion Prevailed
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 10-1(c), move to compile the following AM's; AMs 244, 245, 246, 416, 417 and 418 (Board of Trustees of Western Illinois University); AM 310 (Student Assistance Commission); AM 364 (Illinois Workforce Investment Board); AMs 366, 367, 368, 369, 370, and 371 (Illinois DREAM Commission); AMs 372, 373, 374, 375, 376, 377 and 378 (Board of Trustees of the Historic Preservation Agency); AMs 379, 380 and 381 (Board of the Illinois State Museum); AM 382 (Illinois Torture Inquiry and Relief Commission); AM 384 (Employment Security Advisory Board); AM 385 (Havana Regional Port District Board); AM 410 (Carnival-Amusement Safety Board)
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments April 24, 2012
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
April 26, 2012: AM0366 - Thursday, April 26, 2012
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor