+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 041-000-002
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Antonio Muñoz; AMs 155, 156, 157, 158, 159, 160, 161, 162, 163, 164, 165 and 166 (Workers' Compensation Advisory Board) AM 306 (Board of Trustees for Northern Illinois University) AMs 311, 312, 313 and 314 (Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library Advisory Board) AMs 341, 342, 343, 344, 345, 346 and 347 (Employment Security Advisory Board) AM 352 (Capital Development Board)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 10-1(c), move to compile the following AM's
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 8, 2012
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
February 24, 2012: AM0347 - Friday, February 24, 2012
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor