+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 048-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments January 2, 2013
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 008-000-000
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
On November 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On November 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
January 2, 2013: AM0260 - Wednesday, January 02, 2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor