+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 042-000-003
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 23, 2012
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
On November 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On November 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
February 24, 2012: AM0210 - Friday, February 24, 2012
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor