+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 036-015-001
On November 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments November 28, 2012
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 005-002-000
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive Appointments
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On January 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
On November 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On July 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
On June 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed in Executive Appointments
On June 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
November 28, 2012: AM0125 - Wednesday, November 28, 2012
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor