+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 055-000-003
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments March 19, 2014
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 009-000-000
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Vote
March 20, 2014: AM0122 - Thursday, March 20, 2014
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor