+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Consent Passed 050-001-000
On October 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments October 27, 2021
- Recommends Do Consent Executive Appointments; 006-000-000
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 01/10/2021 - and on 01/13/2021, Due to Sine Die of the 101st General Assembly
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 01/10/2021
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2022: AM1010601
October 26, 2021: AM1010601 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor