+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Consent Passed 050-000-000
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments February 8, 2022
- Recommends Do Consent Executive Appointments; 008-000-000
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 05/20/2020 - and on 01/13/2021, Due to Sine Die of the 101st General Assembly
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 05/20/2020
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
February 8, 2022: AM1010501
February 2, 2022: AM1010501 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor