+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Consent Passed 057-000-000
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Appointment Messages Be Acted on Together ** Sen. Laura M. Murphy; AMs1010358,1010359,1010360-1010362,1010370,1010401-1010404 (ALPL and Museum Board of Trustees)1010366,1010367,1010372 (Amusement Ride & Attraction Safety Brd) 1010312 (CDB) 1010411,1010412,1010421,1010422 (Children & Family Services Advisory Board) 1010268, 1010269,1010270,1010272 (Committee for Agricultural Education) 1010278,1010279,1010280,1010281,1010282,1010283,1010297 (Governor's State University Board of Trustees) 1010405,1010406 (Guardian & Advocacy Comm.)1010264,1010265,1010266 (Health Facilities & Services Review Board) 1010291,1010292,1010293,1010294 (IL Board of Higher Education) 1010431,1010443 (IL Community College Board) 1010432,1010433 (IL Criminal Justice Info. Auth) 1010254 (IL Fin Auth) 1010257,1010286 (IL Gaming Board) 1010444 (IHDA) 1010251,1010322,1010323,1010324,1010325 (IL Student Assist Comm) 1010390 (IL Torture Inquiry & Relief Comm) 1010425 (IL Sports Facilities Auth) 1010386 (Metro Pier and Exposition Auth) 1010331,1010332,1010333 (New Harmony Bridge Auth) 1010336 (Public Admin and Public Guardian for Rock Island County) 1010313 (Advocate for Public Admin and Public Guardian for Tazewell County) 1010377 (Public Admin and Public Guardian for Christian County) 1010378 (Public Admin and Public Guardian for Knox County) 1010426 (Public Admin and Public Guardian for Mason County) 1010379 (Public Admin and Public Guardian for McHenry County) 1010381 (Public Admin and Public Guardian for Warren County) 1010374,1010375,1010376 (Quality Care Bd) 1010334 (Secure Choice Savings Board)1010435-1010437,1010440-1010442,1010445 (SBH) 1010335 (SBI) 1010248,1010249 (TRS Board of Trustees)1010364 (Treasurer's Personnel Review Brd) 1010250 (Charitable Trust Stabilization Committee) 1010413,1010414,1010427-1010429 (UIRVDev.Auth) 1010348,1010349 (Western IL Bd ofTrustees)1010338,1010339,1010344,1010346,1010351,1010352,1010353,1010354,1010407,1010446 (Worker's Comp. Advis Bd) 1010395,1010434,1010447 (Worker's Comp.Med Fee Advis Bd)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 10-1(c), move to compile the following AM's
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments May 24, 2021
- Recommends Do Consent Executive Appointments; 006-000-000
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments; on 10/28/2019 - and on 01/13/2021, Due to Sine Die of the 101st General Assembly
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz; on 10/28/2019
- ** Appointment Message Carried Over from Previous General Assembly **
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2021: AM1010312
May 20, 2021: AM1010312 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor