+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Appointment Confirmed
- Do Advise and Consent Passed 057-000-000
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Executive Appointments October 28, 2019
- Recommends Do Advise and Consent Executive Appointments; 007-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Appointments
- Received by the Senate Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Votes (2)
October 30, 2019: AM1010063
June 12, 2019: AM1010063 - Executive Appointments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor