+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Read in Full a Third Time
- Removed from Short Debate Status
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Unlimited Debate
- Third Reading - Unlimited Debate - Passed 080-030-000
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-004-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Read in Full a Second Time
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read in Full a Third Time
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-007-000
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- Read in Full a First Time
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read in Full a Second Time
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021; Constitutional Amendments
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Be Adopted Executive; 012-003-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading Constitutional Amendments
- Read in Full a First Time
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021; Constitutional Amendments
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Statute Amended
- ILCON Art. I, Sec. 25 new
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2021: SJRCA0011 - Amendments
May 25, 2021: SJRCA0011 - Labor & Commerce
May 21, 2021: SJRCA0011 - Third Reading
May 19, 2021: SJRCA0011 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor