+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On July 2, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Agriculture & Conservation Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 049-000-000
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 24, 2018
- Be Adopted Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Conservation
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2018: SJR0073 - Agriculture & Conservation
May 25, 2018: SJR0073 - Motion To Adopt
May 23, 2018: SJR0073 - Environment and Conservation
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor