+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 12, 2016
- Be Adopted Public Health; 006-000-000
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2016: SJR0054 - Human Services
May 10, 2016: SJR0054 - Public Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor