+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 109-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 016-000-000
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 29, 2015
- Be Adopted Transportation; 011-000-000
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Votes (4)
July 8, 2015: SJR0004 - Wednesday, July 08, 2015
May 31, 2015: SJR0004 - Motion To Adopt - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 28, 2015: SJR0004 - Transportation - May 28, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor