+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 111-000-000
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 017-000-000
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2015
- Be Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Filed with Secretary
+ − Votes (4)
May 30, 2015: SJR0024 - Saturday, May 30, 2015
May 26, 2015: SJR0024 - Motion To Adopt - Tuesday, May 26, 2015
May 12, 2015: SJR0024 - Transportation - May 12, 2015
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor