+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Managed Care Organizations (MCO's)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor