+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0039
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2012
On June 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000
On April 25, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 010-000-000
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011
- Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that blue oscillating, rotating or flashing lights and flashing white headlights and blue grill lights on certain emergency vehicles may be lighted when parked or stationary at the scene of a fire, rescue call, ambulance call, or motor vehicle accident.
+ − Statute Amended
- 605 ILCS 10/19 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-19