+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (93)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-1005
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date December 12, 2008
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James A. DeLeo
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James A. DeLeo
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James A. DeLeo
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 045-006-000
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 045-006-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-006-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 008-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen May
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Availability and Access Committee; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) November 20, 2008; 01,02,03
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Gary Hannig
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James A. DeLeo
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02,03
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Availability and Access Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2008
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 10, 2008
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 2, 2007
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 12, 2007
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 12, 2007
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Delgado
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 010-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William Delgado
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Delgado
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 007-005-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that the Local Government Health Insurance Reserve Fund is created as a nonappropriated trust fund to be held outside the State Treasury, with the State Treasurer as custodian, and that interest earned on moneys in the Local Government Health Insurance Reserve Fund shall be deposited into the Fund. Effective immediately.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act to provide individuals under 21 years of age coverage for autism spectrum disorders to the extent that the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorders are not already covered by the policy or plan. Provides that this coverage shall be subject to a maximum benefit of $36,000 per year, but shall not be subject to any limits on the number of visits to an autism service provider. Sets forth definitions for "autism spectrum disorders", "diagnosis of autism spectrum disorders", "medically necessary", and "treatment for autism spectrum disorders". Imposes conditions on any rulemaking authority. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
House Floor Amendment No. 2
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Illinois Insurance Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act to provide individuals under 21 years of age coverage for autism spectrum disorders to the extent that the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorders are not already covered by the policy or plan. Provides that this coverage shall be subject to a maximum benefit of $36,000 per year, but shall not be subject to any limits on the number of visits to an autism service provider. Sets forth definitions for "autism spectrum disorders", "diagnosis of autism spectrum disorders", "medically necessary", and "treatment for autism spectrum disorders". Imposes conditions on any rulemaking authority. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Hearing Screening for Newborns Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health may levy fees to cover the cost of maintaining the registry and conducting the follow-up services specified in the Act. Provides that the fees shall be deposited into the Newborn Hearing Screening Administration, Tracking, and Follow-up Fund, a special fund created in the State treasury to be used by the Department of Public Health, the Department of Human Services, and the University of Illinois at Chicago for the purposes of providing newborn hearing screening administration, tracking, follow-up, and treatment. Provides that other funds related to newborn hearing services may also be deposited into the Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to include the Newborn Hearing Screening Administration, Tracking, and Follow-up Fund. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Provides that the amount of funds provided through the fee levied to cover the cost of the registry created under the Hearing Screening for Newborns Act shall not exceed the amount necessary to fully achieve the intent of the Act.