+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On November 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 19, 2021
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 100/5-90 - from Ch. 127, par. 1005-90
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2022: SFA0001 - Executive
March 24, 2021: SB0932 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor