+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011
- Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 515 ILCS 5/1-5 - from Ch. 56, par. 1-5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor