+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
+ − Statute Amended
- 25 ILCS 170/6 - from Ch. 63, par. 176
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor