+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance & Pensions
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Insurance & Pensions
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lawrence M. Walsh