+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- To Income Tax Subcommittee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2019
- Second Reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 19, 2019
- Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver