+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Steve McClure
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 6, 2019: SB0905 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor